Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos de São José e Souza, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1776³BornRecife
4 Dec 179721.2ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
21 Dec 179923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
3 Oct 184367.1SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
22 Jan 184467.4ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
2 Jun 184467.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
3 Apr 185073.6DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos de São José e Souza:
Bishop Carlos de São José e Souza O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013