Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomas Manoel de Noronha e Brito, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Olinda, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1770Born
15 Mar 179424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jun 181949.3SelectedBishop of Cochin, India
17 Dec 181949.8ConfirmedBishop of Cochin, India
4 Mar 182151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
24 Nov 182757.8SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
23 Jun 182858.3ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
30 Jun 183060.4ResignedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
9 Jul 184777.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tomas Manoel de Noronha e Brito
Bishop Tomas Manoel de Noronha e Brito O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Olinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Portugal

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 155, and Page 290
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast