Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Almeida Ferrão (Terra)

Deceased

Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1853BornCampanha
25 Jun 187622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Brazil
29 Apr 190955.7AppointedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Sep 190956.0Ordained BishopBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Dec 193582.3DiedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João de Almeida Ferrão (Terra):
Bishop João de Almeida Ferrão (Terra) (born , died ) Bishop of Campanha

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015