Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Antônio Pimenta

Deceased

Bishop of Montes Claros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1859BornCapelinha
10 Jun 188323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Brazil
21 Feb 190646.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
21 Feb 190646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
20 May 190646.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
7 Mar 191151.2AppointedBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
20 Jul 194383.6DiedBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Antônio Pimenta:
Bishop João Antônio Pimenta (born , died ) Bishop of Montes Claros

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013