Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlos Pereira Freire de Moura

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1785³BornMinas Novas
30 Jul 180924.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Aug 180924.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 184055.4SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
17 Dec 184055.8ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
4 Mar 184156.0DiedBishop-Elect of Mariana, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Pereira Freire de Moura:
Priest Carlos Pereira Freire de Moura (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Mariana

  • a priest for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013