Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Jesus Jardim, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1730¹BornSabará, Brazil
18 Mar 175424.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Orden de San Jerónimo
13 Apr 175424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerónimo
1 Sep 178454.6SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
14 Feb 178555.1ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
17 Apr 178555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
30 Oct 179363.8SelectedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
21 Feb 179464.1ConfirmedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
30 May 179666.4DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Jesus Jardim:
Bishop Diego de Jesus Jardim O.S.H. (born 1730, died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207, and Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 15 Jan 2016