Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregório dos Anjos, C.S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹BornLisboa
1635²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 167765.6AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
23 Jan 167866.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
11 May 168977.3DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregório dos Anjos:
Bishop Gregório dos Anjos C.S.J. (born 1612, died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,167
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015