Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Pimentel, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1676Born
13 May 172044.3SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
20 Jan 172145.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
1 Mar 172145.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
6 Mar 175276.1DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pimentel
Archbishop Antonio Pimentel S.J. (born 1676, died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017