Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pinheiro, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹BornCastello Branco
21 Feb 172556.1AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
3 Mar 172657.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
15 Mar 174475.2DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Pinheiro:
Bishop José Pinheiro S.J. (born 1669, died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015