Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Lolière-Puycontat, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Iuliopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1685Born
28 Aug 173852.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
28 Aug 173852.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
20 Mar 174054.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
8 Dec 175570.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Jean de Lolière-Puycontat
Bishop Jean de Lolière-Puycontat M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrignol, France

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 247, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017