Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaud-François Lefèbvre, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Nea Aule


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1709BornCalais, France
6 Oct 174131.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
6 Oct 174131.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nea Aule
6 Jan 174333.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nea Aule
27 Mar 176050.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Arnaud-François Lefèbvre:
Bishop Arnaud-François Lefèbvre M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 304, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015