Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João do Nascimento (Marques de Fonseca), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1687³BornLisboa
21 Sep 171527.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
29 Sep 171528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Dec 174053.1SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
2 Jan 174153.2AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
5 Mar 174153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
6 Nov 175366.1DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João do Nascimento (Marques de Fonseca):
Bishop João do Nascimento (Marques de Fonseca) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015