Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Villas Boas e Sampaio

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1691³Born
19 Sep 172231.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 174251.1SelectedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
26 Nov 174251.5ConfirmedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
13 Jan 174351.6Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
14 Jun 174352.1DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Villas Boas e Sampaio
Bishop Pedro de Villas Boas e Sampaio (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto

  • a priest for 20.7 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017