Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Júlio Francisco de Oliveira, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1693³BornLisboa
16 Jul 170714.2ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
28 Mar 171622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
22 Feb 173945.8SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
6 Dec 174047.6SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
2 Jan 174147.7ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
5 Mar 174147.8Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
26 Dec 176572.6DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Júlio Francisco de Oliveira:
Bishop Júlio Francisco de Oliveira C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221, and Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015