Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano de Nossa Senhora

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1684BornObidos
7 Dec 170824.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 174258.1AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
15 Apr 177186.5DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Feliciano de Nossa Senhora:
Bishop Feliciano de Nossa Senhora (died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 62.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013