Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonius Taveira de Neiva Brum

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1705¹BornHorta
28 Dec 173631.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jan 173732.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 174944.8SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
19 Jan 175045.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
8 Mar 175045.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
11 Dec 177368.9ResignedArchbishop of Goa, India
2 Jun 177570.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonius Taveira de Neiva Brum:
Archbishop Antonius Taveira de Neiva Brum (born 1705, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Goa

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,076
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015