Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leandro de Santo Agostinho da Piedade, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1688³BornLisboa, Portugal
31 Dec 171224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
27 Dec 171325.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Agostiniani Scalzi
21 Jul 173849.6SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
3 Sep 173849.8ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
25 Jan 173950.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1740¹51.1DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leandro de Santo Agostinho da Piedade:
Bishop Leandro de Santo Agostinho da Piedade O.A.D. (born , died 1740) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,024
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015