Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Moreira, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1688³Born
21 May 171224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jul 174254.2SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
26 Nov 174254.6ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
17 Feb 174354.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
13 Aug 174759.3DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de Moreira
Bishop João de Moreira O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinheiro, Portugal

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,455
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017