Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago López de Rego y Labarta, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Dionysiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1869Born
30 Aug 190334.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
25 May 192354.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
25 May 192354.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiopolis
26 Aug 192354.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiopolis
29 Oct 193869.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
23 Aug 194172.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Santiago López de Rego y Labarta
Bishop Santiago López de Rego y Labarta S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Compostela, Spain

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018