Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Antonio Frasella, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Japan

Titular Archbishop of Myra

Titular See: (Antonio de San Felice)


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1637AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
30 Nov 1637Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
26 Feb 1638AppointedApostolic Administrator of Japan
1661¹DiedApostolic Administrator of Japan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Frasella
Archbishop Francesco Antonio Frasella O.F.M. Conv. (died 1661) Apostolic Administrator of Japan

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,637, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast