Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Schiattini

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹BornChios
5 May 162537.3AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
13 Sep 162638.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
13 Feb 165769.1DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Schiattini:
Archbishop Raffaele Schiattini (died ) Archbishop of Naxos

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1626, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015