Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lilio Livioi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Constantinople

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹Born
18 Aug 162550.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Constantinople
18 Aug 162550.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
24 Aug 162550.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
22 Jun 164368.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Constantinople

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lilio Livioi
Archbishop Lilio Livioi (born 1575, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaxos, Greece

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,625, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast