Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Laucaigne, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Southern Japan

Titular Bishop of Apollonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1838Born
1859²20.6ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
25 Dec 186224.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Oct 187335.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Japan
3 Oct 187335.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
24 Feb 187435.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
22 May 187638.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southern Japan
7 Oct 188446.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Southern Japan
18 Jan 188546.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Southern Japan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Laucaigne
Bishop Joseph-Marie Laucaigne M.E.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Southern Japan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGardéres, France
Ordained BishopNagasaki

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Oct 2017