Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelin-Charles Marty

Deceased

Bishop of Nmes (-Uzs e Als), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1862Born
1 Mar 189027.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 191956.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nmes (-Uzs e Als), France
14 Apr 191956.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Isinda
2 Jul 191956.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isinda
3 Feb 192158.4SucceededBishop of Nmes (-Uzs e Als), France
5 Aug 192461.9DiedBishop of Nmes (-Uzs e Als), France

MicroData Summary for Marcelin-Charles Marty
Bishop Marcelin-Charles Marty (born , died ) Bishop of Nmes (-Uzs e Als)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVabre-de-Rieupeyroux

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales, Issue 1919, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017