Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Grolleau

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1828BornChavagnes-les-Eaux
17 Dec 185325.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 187041.6SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
27 Jun 187041.7ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
8 Sep 187041.9Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
3 Apr 189061.4DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for François Grolleau:
Bishop François Grolleau (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013