Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Boutonnet

Deceased

Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1802Born
20 May 182624.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 186259.9SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
7 Apr 186260.0ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
15 Jun 186260.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
13 Nov 186866.6DiedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Antoine Boutonnet (VIAF: 14763288)
Bishop Antoine Boutonnet (born , died ) Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorayzès, Diocese of Rodez, France, France
Ordained BishopS. Sulpice, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017