Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Bel, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1823Born
1846¹22.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
1847¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
11 Jul 186541.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
11 Jul 186541.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
22 Oct 186542.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
1 Mar 186844.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Bel (VIAF: 44291607)
Bishop Louis Bel C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfranc, France
Ordained Bishop95, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 21.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017