Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Claudius Angénor

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Les Cayes, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1916Born
11 Jul 194327.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 196650.3AppointedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
28 Oct 196650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
9 Apr 198871.9ResignedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
25 Nov 199074.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Les Cayes, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Claudius Angénor
Bishop Jean-Jacques Claudius Angénor (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Les Cayes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCap-Haitien

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018