Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Jan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1875BornCléguérec, France
29 Jun 189822.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 192448.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
15 Jan 192448.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
30 Mar 192448.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
4 Feb 192953.3SucceededBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
10 Mar 192953.4InstalledBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
27 Jun 195377.7RetiredBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
27 Jun 195377.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Edistiana
9 Dec 197095.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Edistiana
13 Dec 197297.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Jan:
Bishop Jean-Marie Jan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien

  • a priest for 74.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013