Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maurice Le Mailloux, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kankan, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1913²Born
2 Jul 193926.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 Aug 193926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Mar 195037.2AppointedPrefect of Kankan, Guinea
Dec 1957³44.9ResignedPrefect of Kankan, Guinea
Jun 2006³93.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kankan, Guinea

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurice Le Mailloux
Father Maurice Le Mailloux C.S.Sp. (born 1913, died Jun 2006) Prefect Emeritus of Kankan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrance
Ordained DeaconChevilly
Ordained PriestLangonnet

  • a priest for 66.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: AM, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast