Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Marie Guiot, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port-de-Paix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1896BornPontchâteau, France
14 Jun 192427.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
14 Jan 193639.4AppointedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
25 Mar 193639.5Ordained BishopBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
5 Oct 197579.1DiedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Albert-Marie Guiot:
Bishop Albert-Marie Guiot S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Port-de-Paix

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013