Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Kébreau, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1938 BornJérémie
16 Aug 196324.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 May 197435.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Nov 198648.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
25 Nov 198648.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Selendeta
25 Jan 198748.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selendeta
30 Jun 199859.6AppointedBishop of Hinche, Haïti
1 Mar 200869.3AppointedArchbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
22 Nov 201476.0RetiredArchbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Louis Kébreau:
Archbishop Louis Kébreau S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cap-Haïtien.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014