Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl-Édouard Peters, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jérémie, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1911Born
7 Mar 193624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
17 Oct 196655.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
17 Oct 196655.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
28 Oct 196655.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
20 Apr 197260.9AppointedBishop of Jérémie, Haïti
4 Jul 197564.1DiedBishop of Jérémie, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Carl-Édouard Peters
Bishop Carl-Édouard Peters S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Jérémie

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
Death PlacePort-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • fn/bd: CB, 3 Aug 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast