Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Augusto Rodríguez Álvarez

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Aeliae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1962 Born
13 Dec 198725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
13 Apr 201956.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
13 Apr 201956.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeliae
6 Jul 201957.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aeliae

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Augusto Rodríguez Álvarez
Bishop Ricardo Augusto Rodríguez Álvarez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Apr 2019
  • c1: CB, 28 Apr 2019
  • c34: CB, 6 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast