Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Cefai, M.S.S.P.

Prelate of Santiago Apóstol de Huancané, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1967 Born
1984²16.4EnteredMember of Missionary Society of St. Paul
23 Oct 199427.2Solemn VowsMember of Missionary Society of St. Paul
6 Dec 199730.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Paul
3 Apr 201951.6AppointedPrelate of Santiago Apóstol de Huancané, Peru
22 Jun 201951.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Santiago Apóstol de Huancané, Peru
30 Jun 201951.9InstalledPrelate of Santiago Apóstol de Huancané, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cefai
Father Giovanni Cefai M.S.S.P. (born ) Prelate of Santiago Apóstol de Huancané

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZebbug, Diocese of Gozo, Malta
Ordained PriestCathedral, Gozo, Diocese of Gozo, Malta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arequipa, Archdiocese of Arequipa

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Prelature of Santiago Apóstol de Huancané.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2019
  • c1: CB, 3 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 5 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast