Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Javier Augusto Del Río Alba

Archbishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1957 Born
21 Nov 199234.9Ordained PriestPriest of Callao, Peru
12 Oct 200446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Callao, Peru
12 Oct 200446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
21 Nov 200446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes
11 Jul 200648.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Arequipa, Peru
21 Oct 200648.8SucceededArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Javier Augusto Del Río Alba
Archbishop Javier Augusto Del Río Alba (born ) Archbishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Arequipa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,716
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018