Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Guillermo Teodoro Elías Millares

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Turres in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1953 Born
8 Dec 198128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
14 Dec 199643.0IncardinatedPriest of Carabayllo, Peru
13 Apr 201965.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
13 Apr 201965.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres in Numidia
6 Jul 201965.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Teodoro Elías Millares
Father Guillermo Teodoro Elías Millares (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast