Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odorico Leovigildo Sáiz Pérez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Requena

Titular Bishop of Simingi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1912BornRevilla del Campo, Spain
13 Mar 193725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Nov 197361.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Requena, Peru
26 Nov 197361.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Simingi
10 Mar 197462.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simingi
15 May 198775.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Requena, Peru
14 Oct 2012100.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Requena, Peru

MicroData Summary for Odorico Leovigildo Sáiz Pérez:
Bishop Odorico Leovigildo Sáiz Pérez O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Requena

  • a priest for 75.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013