Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Tomás Oliver Climent, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Requena

Titular Bishop of Legis Volumni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1951 BornCarcaixent, Spain
16 Aug 197220.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Aug 197523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Feb 200452.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Requena, Peru
27 Feb 200452.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Legis Volumni
6 Jun 200452.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legis Volumni
30 Jul 200553.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Requena, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Tomás Oliver Climent:
Bishop Juan Tomás Oliver Climent O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Requena

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Requena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,609
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013