Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hugo Garaycoa Hawkins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1930Born
9 Jul 196131.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 198252.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
16 Dec 198252.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Horaea
25 Jan 198352.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horaea
6 Jun 199161.0AppointedBishop of Tacna, Peru
1 Sep 200676.2RetiredBishop of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru
27 Mar 201887.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Hugo Garaycoa Hawkins (VIAF: 88930989)
Bishop José Hugo Garaycoa Hawkins (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tacna y Moquegua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCallao
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast