Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Aurelio Brazzini Diaz-Ufano

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

Titular Bishop of Assava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1937BornLima
25 Mar 197133.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
1 Jun 197840.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
1 Jun 197840.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Assava
22 Jul 197840.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assava
29 May 200163.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Alberto Aurelio Brazzini Diaz-Ufano:
Bishop Alberto Aurelio Brazzini Diaz-Ufano (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013