Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Julio Alzamora Revoredo, S. M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tacna y Moquegua

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1929BornLima
29 Mar 196334.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
16 Dec 198253.9AppointedBishop of Tacna, Peru
25 Mar 198354.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tacna, Peru
13 Feb 199162.1ResignedBishop of Tacna, Peru
13 Feb 199162.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
20 May 199970.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru

MicroData Summary for Oscar Julio Alzamora Revoredo:
Bishop Oscar Julio Alzamora Revoredo S. M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tacna y Moquegua

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013