Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Vallejos Santoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1917BornCallao
21 Dec 195740.8Ordained PriestPriest of Callao, Peru
20 Sep 197154.6AppointedBishop of Callao, Peru
21 Nov 197154.8Ordained BishopBishop of Callao, Peru
14 Jan 197557.9AppointedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
Mar 197558.0InstalledArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
8 Jun 198265.3DiedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Vallejos Santoni:
Archbishop Luis Vallejos Santoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Cuzco

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015