Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Galberry, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1833Born
4 Jan 185319.6ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Dec 185623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
12 Feb 187541.7AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
19 Mar 187642.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
10 Oct 187845.3DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Galberry
Bishop Thomas Galberry O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaas, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Hartford, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut

  • a priest for 21.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018