Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Thomas O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1833Born
15 Aug 185723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
23 Jun 187036.4AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
25 Sep 187036.7Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
28 May 189258.4DiedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Thomas O’Reilly
Bishop Patrick Thomas O’Reilly (born , died ) Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilnaleck, Diocese of Kilmore, Ireland
Ordained BishopSpringfield, Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Mar 2017