Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stephen Michaud

Deceased

Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1843Born
7 Jun 187329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Burlington, Vermont, USA
4 May 189248.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
4 May 189248.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
29 Jun 189248.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modra
3 Nov 189955.9SucceededBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
22 Dec 190865.0DiedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for John Stephen Michaud
Bishop John Stephen Michaud (born , died ) Bishop of Burlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurlington, Diocese of Burlington, Vermont
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Burlington, Diocese of Burlington, Vermont

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017