Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard James Olivier, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia

Titular Bishop of Legia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1923BornLake Charles, LA
29 Jun 195127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
10 Nov 198865.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
10 Nov 198865.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Legia
20 Dec 198865.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legia
18 May 200480.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
19 Nov 201491.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for Leonard James Olivier:
Bishop Leonard James Olivier S.V.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Washington

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,928
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014