Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco González Valer, S.F.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Titular Bishop of Lamphua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1939 Born
1 May 196424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hijos de la Sagrada Familia
28 Dec 200162.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Dec 200162.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamphua
11 Feb 200262.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamphua
27 May 201475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for Francisco González Valer
Bishop Francisco González Valer S.F. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcos de Jalon, Soria, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Washington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,133
  • r: Bollettino, 27 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018