Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Charles Evans

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

Titular Bishop of Aquae Regiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1947 Born
2 Jul 197325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
15 Oct 200962.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
15 Oct 200962.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
15 Dec 200962.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
23 Nov 202275.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Charles Evans
(WikiData: Q2156759)
Bishop Robert Charles Evans (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoultrie, GA, Diocese of Savannah-Atlanta, Georgia
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Providence.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,329
  • op.loc: CB, 21 Oct 2022
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 13 Feb 2024