Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Walter McElroy

Auxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California

Titular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1954 BornSan Francisco
12 Apr 198026.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
6 Jul 201056.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
6 Jul 201056.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
7 Sep 201056.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Robert Walter McElroy:
Bishop Robert Walter McElroy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Francisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Francisco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,783

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013